DC B24-0246 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, Bill 24-246 would authorize the Department of General Services and the Department of Parks and Recreation to rehire retired Metropolitan Police officers as full or part-time employees without jeopardizing retirement benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rehiring of Retired Officers by the Department of General Services and the Department of Parks and Recreation Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-06CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-11-19CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-11-15CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-05-21CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0246 Published in the DC Register
2021-05-18CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations and Facilities
2021-05-12CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback