DC B24-0242 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, Bill 24-242 would provide for the creation and governance of a program to provide beauticians and barbers with behavioral health support training for the benefit of their clientele. FUNDING NOTE - This bill is passed Subject to Appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beautician and Barber Behavioral Health Support Training Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-15CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-11-15CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-10-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-10-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-09-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-09-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-05-18CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2021-05-14CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0242 Published in the DC Register
2021-05-03CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback