DC B24-0240 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-240 would require condo associations with over 6 units to require association fees be paid into an escrow account. It allows those with 6 units or less to waive into the requirement. Association officers are required to receive training on how to manage an association and remain in good standing with the District, among other things.
Title
Condominium Association Strengthening Support Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-08-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Executive Administration |
2021-05-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0240 Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0240 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/47133/Introduction/B24-0240-Introduction.pdf |