DC B24-0236 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Law L24-0053, Effective from Feb 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001670
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Law L24-0053, Effective from Feb 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001670
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-236 would provide a District government-sponsored trust fund for babies born in the District beginning in Tax Year 2022. It would apply to households whose income does not exceed 500% of the Federal Poverty Level (FPL), currently $132,000 for a household of four. Enrollment would be automatic and each eligible child’s trust fund would receive an initial deposit of $1,000. Deposits in subsequent years would increase up to $2,000 depending on household income. At age 18, eligible children may withdraw trust fund proceeds for specified purposes.
FUNDING NOTE - This law was passed Subject to Appropriations. See Bill 24-275 for funding certification.
Title
Child Wealth Building Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Council | Law L24-0053, Effective from Feb 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001670 |
2022-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2021-12-17 | Council | Act A24-0228 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 013227 |
2021-12-13 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-12-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0228 |
2021-12-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 23, 2021 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-11-02 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2021-10-04 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-07-12 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0236 |
2021-07-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-07-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-25 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-05-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0236 Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2021-05-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |