DC B24-0231 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, Bill 24-231 would allow youth who are 16 years of age and older to schedule medical appointments and request medical records without parental consent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minor Access to Medical Records and Appointments Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-15CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-11-15CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-11-15CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-10-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-10-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-09-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-09-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-05-07CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0231 Published in the DC Register
2021-05-04CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2021-04-30CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback