DC B24-0225 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Law L24-0026, Effective from Sep 22, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010520
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Law L24-0026, Effective from Sep 22, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010520
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 24-26 would require insurers to file an annual report that describes the insurer’s corporate governance structure, policies, and practices. It would also grant rulemaking authority to the Commissioner of the Department of Insurance, Securities and Banking to implement the legislation. The Commissioner may also disclose information received pursuant to this act to the NAIC in reviewing the Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure and the Commissioner may also, among other things, enter into written agreements with the NAIC or a third-party consultant governing the sharing and use of information provided pursuant to this act.
Title
Insurer Corporate Governance Annual Report Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Council | Law L24-0026, Effective from Sep 22, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 010520 |
2021-08-13 | Council | Act A24-0150 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 007994 |
2021-08-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2021-08-06 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-08-05 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0150 |
2021-07-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 6, 2021 |
2021-07-13 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-29 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2021-06-24 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-06-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0225 |
2021-06-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-06-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0225 Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2021-04-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |