DC B24-0213 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-213 would prohibit District of Columbia law enforcement officers from engaging in vehicular pursuits, unless the officer reasonably believes that the fleeing suspect has committed or has attempted to commit a crime of violence and that the pursuit is necessary to prevent an imminent death or serious bodily injury and is not likely to put others in danger.
Title
Law Enforcement Vehicular Pursuit Reform Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-04-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0213 Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-04-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0213 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/46984/Introduction/B24-0213-Introduction.pdf |