DC B24-0211 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Law L24-0114, Effective from Apr 26, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 005423
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Law L24-0114, Effective from Apr 26, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 005423
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-211 would order the closing of a portion of Maryland Avenue, S.W.’ and the transfer of jurisdiction of the closed portion of Maryland Avenue and portions of Independence Avenue and 4th and 6th Streets S.W., to the National Park Service.
Title
Closing of a portion of Maryland Avenue, S.W. between Independence Avenue and 6th Street, S.W., and the transfer of jurisdiction of the closed portion of Maryland Avenue and portions of Independence Avenue and 4th and 6th Streets, S.W., S.O. 17-26507, Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Council | Law L24-0114, Effective from Apr 26, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 005423 |
2022-03-18 | Council | Act A24-0345 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002036 |
2022-03-15 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-03-10 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-03-09 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0345 |
2022-02-24 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 10, 2022 |
2022-01-31 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-01-04 | Council | Postponed to Next Meeting |
2022-01-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-12-21 | Council | Postponed to January 4, 2022 |
2021-12-07 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2021-11-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0211 |
2021-10-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-09-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0211 Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |