DC B24-0207 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-07 - Law L24-0170, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011940
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-07 - Law L24-0170, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011940
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-207 limits who may authorize the release of information obtained, collected, or produced by the Department of Health. It would prevent identifying information from being obtained through discovery, or admitted as evidence, in a criminal or civil case in the District of Columbia courts.
Title
HIV/AIDS Data Privacy Protection Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-07 | Council | Law L24-0170, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011940 |
2022-08-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-07-29 | Council | Act A24-0489 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009207 |
2022-07-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-07-25 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0489 |
2022-07-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 25, 2022 |
2022-06-28 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-06-07 | Council | First Reading |
2022-06-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-05-12 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0207 |
2022-05-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-05-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-11 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-03-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-11-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-10-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0207 Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2021-04-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |