DC B24-0201 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-30 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-30 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-201 would require that an applicant for a permit required by the Construction Codes must, under certain circumstances, enter into a voluntary or standard construction management agreement with impacted neighboring property owners and/or the Building Code Official. It also would reduce the number of stop work orders that trigger a denial of future permits for a one year period, among other things.
Title
Construction Management Agreement Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] |
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-08-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0201 Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0201 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/46927/Introduction/B24-0201-Introduction.pdf |