DC B24-0200 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, Bill 24-200 would create a Digital Equity Division within the Office of the Chief Technology Officer. It would require reporting on District residents’ access to High-speed intent service and requires that District residents have a high-speed internet connection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internet Equity Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-20CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-09-17CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-09-16CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-09-16CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-09-09CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-06-04CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-06-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-05-21CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-05-17CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-04-09CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0200 Published in the DC Register
2021-04-06CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations and Facilities
2021-04-01CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback