DC B24-0174 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-07 - Law L24-0169, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011939
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-07 - Law L24-0169, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011939
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-174 would require the Chief Procurement Officer to annually audit the procurement activities of the Department of General Services and require training at the Office of Contracting and Procurement’s Procurement Training Institute by procurement personnel at the Procurement Training Institute. It also would require an annual review of training requirements and needs.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement below.
Title
Procurement Agencies Alignment Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-07 | Council | Law L24-0169, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011939 |
2022-08-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-07-29 | Council | Act A24-0488 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009204 |
2022-07-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-07-25 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0488 |
2022-07-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 25, 2022 |
2022-06-28 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-06-07 | Council | First Reading |
2022-05-23 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-05-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0174 |
2022-05-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-05-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-09-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-09-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-06-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0174 Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations and Facilities |
2021-03-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |