DC B24-0173 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Law L24-0010, Effective from Jul 28, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008592, Expires on Mar 10, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Law L24-0010, Effective from Jul 28, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008592, Expires on Mar 10, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approval of the Transfer of Control of Open Video System Franchisee and Its Open Video System from Radiate Holdings, L.P. to Stonepeak Associates IV, LLC, Temporary Act of 2021
Title
Approval of the Transfer of Control of Open Video System Franchisee and Its Open Video System from Radiate Holdings, L.P. to Stonepeak Associates IV, LLC, Temporary Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | Council | Law L24-0010, Effective from Jul 28, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008592, Expires on Mar 10, 2022 |
2021-06-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2021-06-04 | Council | Act A24-0085 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005827 |
2021-05-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-05-25 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0085 |
2021-05-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-04-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0173 Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-06 | Council | First Reading |
2021-04-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-03-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |