DC B24-0171 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-07 - Law L24-0168, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011938
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-07 - Law L24-0168, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011938
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-171 would require health insurance policies to include coverage for medically necessary foods ordered by a provider for a disease or condition.
Title
Medically Necessary Foods Coverage Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] |
Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-07 | Council | Law L24-0168, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011938 |
2022-08-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-07-29 | Council | Act A24-0487 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009201 |
2022-07-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-07-25 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0487 |
2022-07-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 25, 2022 |
2022-06-28 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-06-07 | Council | First Reading |
2022-06-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-05-12 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0171 |
2022-05-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-05-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-11-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-11-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-10-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0171 Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2021-03-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |