DC B24-0170 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, Bill 24-170 would add affirmative protections for student loan borrowers and prohibit unfair, deceptive, or abusive acts and practices. It also extends a private right of action offered under existing DC consumer protection law, to student loan borrowers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

New Student Loan Borrower Bill of Rights Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-25CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-10-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-09-28CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-04-09CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0170 Published in the DC Register
2021-04-06CouncilReferred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
2021-03-29CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback