DC B24-0167 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Law L24-0093, Effective from Mar 15, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002363
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Law L24-0093, Effective from Mar 15, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002363
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-167 would dedicate Lots 1107 and 1113, in Square 2873 for street purposes to accommodate the extension of W Street, N.W. right-of-way, and establish a 25 foot wide building restriction line on Lots 1106 and 1112 in Square 2873, in Northwest Washington, D.C. in Ward 1.
Title
Dedication of Land for Street Purposes and Establishment of a Building Restriction Line in Square 2873 (S.O. 20-04746) Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Council | Law L24-0093, Effective from Mar 15, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002363 |
2022-01-31 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-01-28 | Council | Act A24-0295 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000606 |
2022-01-24 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-01-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0295 |
2022-01-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 24, 2022 |
2021-12-21 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-12-20 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-12-07 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2021-11-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0167 |
2021-10-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-09-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0167 Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |