DC B24-0160 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on October 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-06 - Law L24-0206, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000002
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on October 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-06 - Law L24-0206, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000002
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-160 would designate the bridge on Benning Road, N.E., located between 34th Street, N.E., and Minnesota Avenue, N.E., in Ward 7, as the Willie J. Hardy Memorial Bridge
Title
Willie J. Hardy Memorial Bridge Designation Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-06 | Council | Law L24-0206, Effective from Dec 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000002 |
2022-11-11 | Council | Act A24-0602 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 013940 |
2022-11-07 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-11-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-10-31 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0602 |
2022-10-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 31, 2022 |
2022-10-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-10-03 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-09-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0160 |
2022-09-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-09-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2021-11-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-11-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-09-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-02 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0160 Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |