DC B24-0154 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Act A24-0080 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005817, Expires on Aug 23, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Act A24-0080 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005817, Expires on Aug 23, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 3, 4, and 5 to Contract No. CW50424 with Acme Auto Leasing, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Title
Modification Nos. 3, 4, and 5 to Contract No. CW50424 with Acme Auto Leasing, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Council | Act A24-0080 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005817, Expires on Aug 23, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-05-25 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0080, Expires on Aug 23, 2021 |
2021-05-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-04-06 | Council | Postponed to 5/4/21 |
2021-04-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-03-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |