DC B24-0135 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, Bill 24-135 would allow a child who was previously under the custody and care of the District, that is placed in permanent care and custody of a parent, guardian or custodian who resides outside of the District of Columbia to continue their education for the remainder of the school year and through the end of the following school year, without being required to pay nonresident tuition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Non-Public Student Educational Continuity Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-15CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-11-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-03-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0135 Published in the DC Register
2021-03-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2021-03-01CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback