DC B24-0131 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-15 - Law L24-0128, Effective from Jun 30, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008333
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-15 - Law L24-0128, Effective from Jun 30, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008333
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-131 would require the Office of the State Superintendent of Education to create and implement a Selective Service awareness campaign.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations.
Title
Selective Service Federal Benefits Awareness Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-15 | Council | Law L24-0128, Effective from Jun 30, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008333 |
2022-05-17 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-05-06 | Council | Act A24-0389 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 004400 |
2022-05-03 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-05-03 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0389 |
2022-04-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 3, 2022 |
2022-04-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-03-02 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-03-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-02-15 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0131 |
2021-03-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0131 Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |