DC B24-0123 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-123 would repeal the Emergency and Non-Emergency Telephone Calling Systems Fund since it is not longer being reserved for capital equipment costs.
Title
E911 Fund Repeal Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-09-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-08-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0123 Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-03-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0123 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/46645/Introduction/B24-0123-Introduction.pdf |