DC B24-0121 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-121 would clarify the fiduciary duties of agents to their principals and protect individuals creating powers of attorney against fraud. It also provides protections from third parties who deal with agents exercising powers of attorney and it creates a uniform statutory form to create a power of attorney.
Title
Uniform Power of Attorney Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-18 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-04 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-04 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023 |
2022-12-02 | Council | Act A24-0654 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 014660 |
2022-11-22 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-11-21 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0654 |
2022-11-04 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 21, 2022 |
2022-10-18 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-10-04 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-09-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-09-27 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0121 |
2022-09-26 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2021-05-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-04-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0121 Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-03-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |