DC B24-0120 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-120 would reform the Emergency Rental Assistance Program to aid tenants in their recovery from the public health emergency and to reduce administrative barriers to Emergency Rental Assistance Program payments for tenants in need.
Title
Emergency Rental Assistance Reform Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-12 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-01-10 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0725 |
2022-12-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 12, 2023 |
2022-12-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-12-20 | Council | Amendment (Nadeau) |
2022-12-06 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-11-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-11-30 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0120 |
2022-11-18 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-04-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-04-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-04-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0120 Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Human Services |
2021-03-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |