DC B24-0118 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, Bill 24-118 would require a regulatory scheme to license the cultivation, production, and retail sale of cannabis in the District. It would require that 50% of tax revenues from the sale of cannabis be deposited into a Community Reinvestment Program Fund and require automatic expungement of D.C. Code cannabis-related arrests and convictions, and provide an opportunities for re-sentencing of cannabis-related convictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive Cannabis Legalization and Regulation Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-19CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-10-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-09-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-03-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0118 Published in the DC Register
2021-03-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2021-03-01CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback