DC B24-0113 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-20 - Final Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-20 - Final Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-113 would allow qualifying patients to obtain their medical cannabis and medical cannabis products from any dispensary registered in the District. Dispensaries would operate safe use treatment facilities as well as offer tastings and demonstrations and/or classes with the proper endorsements. It would allow delivery and curbside pickup services by dispensaries. It eliminates the count on the number of plants that a cultivation center can grow and increases the number of permitted dispensaries in the District. Among other things it removes certain prohibitions against returning citizens ability to take part in the medical marijuana industry.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see Fiscal Impact Statement for more information.
Title
Medical Cannabis Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-12-19 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-12-06 | Council | First Reading |
2022-12-06 | Council | Amendment (Allen) - Moved at Committee of the Whole |
2022-12-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0113 |
2022-11-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-11-29 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0113 |
2022-11-28 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-10-24 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-10-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0113 |
2022-10-20 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2021-11-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-10-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0113 Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-02-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |