DC B24-0113 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, Bill 24-113 would allow qualifying patients to obtain their medical cannabis and medical cannabis products from any dispensary registered in the District. Dispensaries would operate safe use treatment facilities as well as offer tastings and demonstrations and/or classes with the proper endorsements. It would allow delivery and curbside pickup services by dispensaries. It eliminates the count on the number of plants that a cultivation center can grow and increases the number of permitted dispensaries in the District. Among other things it removes certain prohibitions against returning citizens ability to take part in the medical marijuana industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Cannabis Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-19CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-10-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-09-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-03-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0113 Published in the DC Register
2021-03-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2021-02-26CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback