DC B24-0112 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-112 would require the DC Auditor to investigate whether there are ties between white supremacist or other hate groups to members of the Metropolitan Police Department and to recommend any necessary reforms to better detect and prevent any ties.
Title
White Supremacy in Policing Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-04-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0112 Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-02-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0112 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/46633/Introduction/B24-0112-Introduction.pdf |