DC B24-0111 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Law L24-0051, Effective from Feb 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001668
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Law L24-0051, Effective from Feb 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001668
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-111 would offer motor vehicle accident prevention classroom and online courses to any licensed driver in the District which would avail them to reductions in motor vehicle insurance premiums. It also would update course criteria to reflect Vision Zero.
Title
Motor Vehicle Accident Prevention Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Council | Law L24-0051, Effective from Feb 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 001668 |
2022-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2021-12-31 | Council | Act A24-0259 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 014087 |
2021-12-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-12-22 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0259 |
2021-12-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 30, 2021 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-11-02 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2021-10-25 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-10-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-10-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-10-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0111 |
2021-04-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-04-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-04-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0111 Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2021-02-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |