DC B24-0094 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-94 requires the Attorney General of the District of Columbia to conduct a study to determine whether the Metropolitan Police Department engaged in biased policing when conducting threat assessments of assemblies within the District of Columbia.
Title
Bias in Threat Assessments Evaluation Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-04-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0094 Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-02-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0094 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/46601/Introduction/B24-0094-Introduction.pdf |