DC B24-0076 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 28 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-12 - Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0754
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 28 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-12 - Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0754
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Special Education Attorneys for Emerging Adult Defendants Amendment Act of 2021 (now known as "Corrections Oversight Improvement Omnibus Amendment Act of 2022")
Title
Special Education Attorneys for Emerging Adult Defendants Amendment Act of 2021 (now known as "Corrections Oversight Improvement Omnibus Amendment Act of 2022")
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-12 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0754 |
2023-01-12 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-12-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 12, 2023 |
2022-12-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-12-06 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-11-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-11-30 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0076 |
2022-11-29 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2021-03-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-02-26 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0076 Published in the DC Register |
2021-02-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |