DC B24-0052 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Law L24-0007, Effective from Jun 24, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 006911, Expires on Feb 04, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Law L24-0007, Effective from Jun 24, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 006911, Expires on Feb 04, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District Government Family Bereavement Leave Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Title
District Government Family Bereavement Leave Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Council | Law L24-0007, Effective from Jun 24, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 006911, Expires on Feb 04, 2022 |
2021-05-11 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2021-05-07 | Council | Act A24-0052 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 004803 |
2021-05-04 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-05-03 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0052 |
2021-04-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 4, 2021 |
2021-04-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-03-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0052 Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-02 | Council | First Reading |
2021-02-02 | Council | Agendized; not considered at the request of Silverman |
2021-02-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-01-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |