DC B24-0044 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-15 - Law L24-0127, Effective from Jun 30, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008332
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-15 - Law L24-0127, Effective from Jun 30, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008332
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reopen Washington DC Alcoholic Beverage Regulation Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Reopen Washington DC Alcoholic Beverage Regulation Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-15 | Council | Law L24-0127, Effective from Jun 30, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 008332 |
2022-05-17 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-05-13 | Council | Act A24-0410 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 005071 |
2022-05-09 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-05-09 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0410 |
2022-04-25 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 9, 2022 |
2022-04-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-03-01 | Council | First Reading |
2022-02-11 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-02-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0044 |
2022-02-09 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-02-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-05-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-04-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-02-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0044 Published in the DC Register |
2021-02-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2021-01-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |