DC B24-0039 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Act A24-0021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 002596, Expires on May 27, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Act A24-0021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 002596, Expires on May 27, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
TOPA COVID-19 Tolling Exemption for Low Income Housing Tax Credit Transfers Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
TOPA COVID-19 Tolling Exemption for Low Income Housing Tax Credit Transfers Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Council | Act A24-0021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 002596, Expires on May 27, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-02-26 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0021, Expires on May 27, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-02-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-01-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |