DC B24-0036 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Law L24-0003, Effective from May 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005596, Expires on Dec 24, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Law L24-0003, Effective from May 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005596, Expires on Dec 24, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adams Morgan Business Improvement District Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Adams Morgan Business Improvement District Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Council | Law L24-0003, Effective from May 13, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005596, Expires on Dec 24, 2021 |
2021-04-02 | Council | Act A24-0040 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 003440 |
2021-04-01 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2021-03-25 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-03-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0040 |
2021-03-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 29, 2021 |
2021-03-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-02-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0036 Published in the DC Register |
2021-02-02 | Council | First Reading |
2021-02-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-01-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |