DC B24-0034 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Act A24-0018 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 002579, Expires on May 27, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Act A24-0018 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 002579, Expires on May 27, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revised Streatery and Pop Up Locations Programs Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Revised Streatery and Pop Up Locations Programs Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Council | Act A24-0018 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 002579, Expires on May 27, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-02-26 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0018, Expires on May 27, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-02-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-01-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |