DC B24-0031 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Gail Cobb Way Designation Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gail Cobb Way Designation Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-03CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-09-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-09-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-03-12CouncilAct A24-0015 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 002557, Expires on May 27, 2021
2021-03-04CouncilReturned from Mayor
2021-02-26CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0015, Expires on May 27, 2021
2021-02-11CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 26, 2021
2021-02-02CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2021-02-02CouncilRetained by the Council
2021-01-28CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback