DC B24-0027 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-27 orders the closing of the 20-foot wide public alley stub in Square 5051 in Northeast, In Ward 7.
Title
Closing of a Public Alley in Square 5051, S.O. 21-00136, Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-09-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-01-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0027 Published in the DC Register |
2021-01-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-01-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0027 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/46336/Introduction/B24-0027-Introduction.pdf |