DC B24-0024 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-06 - Final Reading, CC
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-06 - Final Reading, CC
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-24 would symbolically designate Virginia Avenue N.W., between Rock Creek and Potomac Parkway N.W. and New Hampshire Avenue N.W., in Ward 2, as “Ruth Bader Ginsburg Way”.
Title
Ruth Bader Ginsburg Way Designation Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-11-08 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-10-18 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0024 |
2022-10-18 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2021-11-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-11-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-09-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-01-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0024 Published in the DC Register |
2021-01-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-01-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |