DC B24-0022 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on January 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Law L24-0071, Effective from Feb 24, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on January 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Law L24-0071, Effective from Feb 24, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-22 would symbolically designate New Hampshire Avenue N.W., between Virginia Avenue N.W. and F Street, N.W., in Ward 2, as “Jamal Khashoggi Way”
Title
Jamal Khashoggi Way Designation Act of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Council | Law L24-0071, Effective from Feb 24, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002015 |
2022-01-14 | Council | Act A24-0267 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000184 |
2022-01-11 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-01-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-01-05 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0267 |
2021-12-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 5, 2022 |
2021-12-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-12-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-11-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0022 |
2021-11-16 | Council | First Reading |
2021-11-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-11-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-09-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-01-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0022 Published in the DC Register |
2021-01-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-01-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |