DC B24-0017 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Postponed to 3/3/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Homeland Security Fusion Center and Law Enforcement Authority Temporary Amendment Act of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeland Security Fusion Center and Law Enforcement Authority Temporary Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-15 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02CouncilPostponed to 3/3/2021
2021-01-19CouncilRetained by the Council
2021-01-15CouncilAmendment (Mendelson)
2021-01-15CouncilFirst Reading
2021-01-13CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback