DC B24-0010 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 15 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-12 - Act A24-0010 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001832, Expires on May 03, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 15 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-12 - Act A24-0010 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001832, Expires on May 03, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Government Grant Transparency Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Government Grant Transparency Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Council | Act A24-0010 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001832, Expires on May 03, 2021 |
2021-02-03 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-02-03 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A24-0010, Expires on May 03, 2021 |
2021-01-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 2, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-01-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-01-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |