DC B23-1025 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0602 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001206, Expires on Apr 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0602 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001206, Expires on Apr 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. NFPHC-WC-21-CPC-00009 with Manufacturers Alliance Insurance Company Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2020
Title
Contract No. NFPHC-WC-21-CPC-00009 with Manufacturers Alliance Insurance Company Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0602 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001206, Expires on Apr 12, 2021 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0602, Expires on Apr 12, 2021 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-12-15 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-12-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |