DC B23-0997 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-11 - Act A23-0519 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14429, Expires on Mar 06, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-11 - Act A23-0519 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14429, Expires on Mar 06, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child Enrollment Preference Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Child Enrollment Preference Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-11 | Council | Act A23-0519 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14429, Expires on Mar 06, 2021 |
2020-12-08 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-07 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0519, Expires on Mar 06, 2021 |
2020-11-24 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-11-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 7, 2020 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-11-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |