DC B23-0990 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-11 - Act A23-0515 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14420, Expires on Mar 06, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-11 - Act A23-0515 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14420, Expires on Mar 06, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Low Income Housing Tax Credit TOPA Exemption for Transfers of Interest Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Low Income Housing Tax Credit TOPA Exemption for Transfers of Interest Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-11 | Council | Act A23-0515 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14420, Expires on Mar 06, 2021 |
2020-12-08 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-07 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0515, Expires on Mar 06, 2021 |
2020-11-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 7, 2020 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-10 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-11-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |