DC B23-0987 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-08 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-987 requires the Department of Energy and Environment (DOEE) to develop a methodology to estimate greenhouse gas emissions that occur through the life cycle of certain foods and establish a baseline measurement of emissions associated with the District’s food and beverage purchase. DOEE is also required to prepare a report on how to reduce greenhouse gas emissions associated with District procurement. Contracting agencies are required to reduce overall greenhouse gas emissions associated with food and beverages according to a reduction schedule.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Green Food Purchasing Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-08CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-11-20CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-11-16CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-11-10CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2020-10-30CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0987 Published in the DC Register
2020-10-21CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback