DC B23-0979 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 7, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

CleanEnergy DC Omnibus Technical Amendment Temporary Amendment Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CleanEnergy DC Omnibus Technical Amendment Temporary Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-20CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 7, 2020
2020-11-10CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-11-10CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-10-23CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0979 Published in the DC Register
2020-10-20CouncilFirst Reading
2020-10-19CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback