DC B23-0970 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-970 prohibits discrimination based on hair styles resulting from the immutable characteristics of a hair texture associated with race.
Title
Creating a Respectful and Open World for Natural Hair (CROWN) Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-10-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2020-10-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0970 Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0970 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/45802/Introduction/B23-0970-Introduction.pdf |