DC B23-0959 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-959 makes substantive and technical amendments to current Certified Business Enterprises (CBE) law. It requires a business applying for certification as a Local Business Enterprise (LBE) to be independently owned and operated and eliminates the asset test as a qualification for eligibility. Among other things, It adds protections for CBE subcontractors to be paid in a timely manner.
Title
Supporting Local Business Enterprises Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-10-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0959 Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2020-09-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0959 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/45778/Introduction/B23-0959-Introduction.pdf |