DC B23-0953 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-06 - Act A23-0439 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13016, Expires on Jan 25, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Contract No. NFPHC-MM-20-PA Modifications between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and Arnold’s Used Office Furniture LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Amendment Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contract No. NFPHC-MM-20-PA Modifications between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and Arnold’s Used Office Furniture LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-06CouncilAct A23-0439 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13016, Expires on Jan 25, 2021
2020-11-02CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-10-28CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0439, Expires on Jan 25, 2021
2020-10-20CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 3, 2020
2020-10-06CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-10-06CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-09-29CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback