DC B23-0943 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0495 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13919
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0495 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13919
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revised Streatery and Pop Up Locations Programs Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Revised Streatery and Pop Up Locations Programs Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Council | Act A23-0495 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13919 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-16 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0495 |
2020-11-02 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 17, 2020 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-10-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0943 Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-06 | Council | First Reading |
2020-10-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |